Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/10/2016 at 06:35:38 (UTC).

Horse Sportz Company L L C Et Al VS Los Pintos L L C Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2008 Horse Sportz Company L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Los Pintos L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Talamante, David. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1160

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Talamante, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Horse Sportz Company L L C

Candy Pate

Ralph D Pate

Defendants

Los Pintos L L C

David Menken

3Rd Party Plaintiff

D Menken

3Rd Party Defendant

Arizonas Best Realty

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Beethe

James Broening

Defendant Attorney

R HILL

3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

Lyndon Steimel

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

F Connelly

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2010
  • ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:4/14/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2010
  • NOTE: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2010
  • SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:4/9/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2010
  • NOTE: Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • 078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar (docket date:2/18/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • NOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:2/24/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set (docket date:2/4/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • 019 - ME: Ruling (docket date:1/15/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2010
  • 019 - ME: Ruling (docket date:1/13/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • ORD - Order (docket date:1/15/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
186 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2008
  • NOTE: FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2008
  • ADE - Application For Default (docket date:5/19/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2008
  • AFD - Affidavit On Default (docket date:5/19/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2008
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:5/12/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2008
  • NOTE: FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2008
  • NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel (docket date:5/12/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:4/30/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2008
  • NOTE: LOS PINTOS LLC SERVED 4/22/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2008
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:4/21/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2008
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:4/21/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less