This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/19/2020 at 11:46:08 (UTC).

Henry Lee Mumphrey VS Elena Angel Wassmer

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Henry Lee Mumphrey filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Elena Angel Wassmer. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Mandell, Michael and Crandell, Rusty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6892

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Mandell, Michael

Crandell, Rusty

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Henry Lee Mumphrey

Respondent

Elena Angel Wassmer

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:11/3/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: SOLE LEGAL DECISION MAKING TO PARTY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less