This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:01:36 (UTC).

Henderson Construction Company VS Common Market L L C

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Henderson Construction Company filed an Other lawsuit against Common Market L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Gates, Pamela. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1726

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Gates, Pamela

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Henderson Construction Company

Defendant

Common Market L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aaron Green

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • Docket042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full (docket date:10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • HearingEvent: Forcible Detainer Hearing; Result: Minute Entry Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a), Arizona Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • Docket004 - ME: Hearing Continued (docket date:10/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • HearingEvent: Forcible Detainer Hearing; Result: Continuing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Motion to Continue Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketMCO - Motion To Continue (docket date:10/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: FOR PRE-JUDGMENT PROVISIONAL REMEDY OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAPL - Application (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less