This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/16/2021 at 04:36:00 (UTC).

Helen Goldman VS Jacob Gregory

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Helen Goldman filed an Other lawsuit against Jacob Gregory. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5192

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Helen Goldman

Defendants

Jacob Gregory

Miah Gregory

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Ramirez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:2/5/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JACOB GREGORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MIAH GREGORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less