This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/15/2021 at 08:25:46 (UTC).

Heather Chavez VS Alonzo Chavez

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Heather Chavez filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Alonzo Chavez. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Pineda, Susanna. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1710

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northwest Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Pineda, Susanna

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Heather Chavez

Respondent

Alonzo Chavez

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNOTE: TO EXTEND DISMISSAL DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:1/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNOTE: TO EXTEND DISMISSAL DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:1/22/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service (docket date:11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: SOLE LEGAL DECISION MAKING TO PARTY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less