This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 10/18/2020 at 12:28:37 (UTC).

Heather A Jelinek VS Leland D Jelinek

Case Summary

On 12/04/2018 Heather A Jelinek filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Leland D Jelinek. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Cooper, Katherine and Como, Greg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8641

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Cooper, Katherine

Como, Greg

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Heather A Jelinek

Heather Ann Vick

Respondent

Leland D Jelinek

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Not Classified By Court

Rebecca Watson

Intervenor

Michelle Vick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Gina Becker-Zarling

Respondent Attorney

Yvonne Yragui

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketEXW - Exhibits Work Sheet (docket date:9/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketSWD - Supp Appl For Waiver/Deferral of Costs (docket date:9/1/2020) (filing party: Intervenor(6))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNOTE: WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketOWH - Order Supp Appl W/Out Hearing (docket date:8/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketAOA Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006 (docket date:7/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docket926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling (docket date:7/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docket020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement (docket date:7/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketAOA Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006 (docket date:7/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • HearingEvent: Trial/Evidentiary Hearing; Result: Minute Entry Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL FOR ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:1/16/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:12/5/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:12/5/2018) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:12/5/2018) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:12/5/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:12/5/2018) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:12/5/2018) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:12/5/2018) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:12/5/2018) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:12/5/2018) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less