This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/28/2021 at 07:27:14 (UTC).

Harvey E Quackenbush, Rudy Anthony Simone Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Harvey E Quackenbush, Rudy Anthony Simone was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Marquoit, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3873

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Marquoit, Thomas

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rudy Anthony Simone

Decedent

Harvey E Quackenbush

Not Classified By Court

Michael Quackenbush

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kent Berk

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Joseph Stewart

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • HearingEvent: Miscellaneous - (Appearance)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docket056 - ME: Hearing Set (docket date:2/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • HearingEvent: Miscellaneous - (Appearance); Result: Minute Entry Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAPU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:2/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNOTE: RE PROBATE OF ESTATE AND APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNOH - Notice Of Hearing (docket date:2/2/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketPNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing (docket date:2/1/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket004 - ME: Hearing Continued (docket date:1/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: Miscellaneous - (Appearance); Result: Continuing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • Docket056 - ME: Hearing Set (docket date:12/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketAPU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketPNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing (docket date:10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: OF TELEPHONIC HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:10/6/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: RUDY ANTHONY SIMONE / UNLICENSED FIDUCIARY OVERVIEW / PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketDCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAAR - Accpt Appoint Personal Rep/Guard/Conservator (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less