This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/25/2020 at 09:24:10 (UTC).

Harold Lloyd Gossett VS Sagarrah K Davis

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Harold Lloyd Gossett filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Sagarrah K Davis. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Como, Greg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5663

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Como, Greg

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Harold Lloyd Gossett

Respondent

Sagarrah K Davis

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNOTE: SOLE LEGAL DECISION MAKING TO PARTY B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:11/19/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:11/17/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:11/13/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:11/16/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: FOR JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING WITH JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less