This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:00:30 (UTC).

Hardwoods Specialty Products U S, L P VS C M T Furniture Manufacturing L L C

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Hardwoods Specialty Products U S, L P filed an Other lawsuit against C M T Furniture Manufacturing L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephens, Sherry. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1712

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Stephens, Sherry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hardwoods Specialty Products U S, L P

Defendant

C M T Furniture Manufacturing L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin Branson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Motion for Entry of Default Without Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketMAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:1/4/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Lodging Proposed Form of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:1/4/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Affidavit of Attorney's Fees and Statement of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees (docket date:1/4/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:12/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Affidavit for Entry of Default Against Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Application for Entry of Default Against Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNOTE: CMT FURNITURE MANUFACTURING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less