This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 22:11:48 (UTC).

Hancock Builders L L C VS Alpha Geotechnical & Materials Inc Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Hancock Builders L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Alpha Geotechnical Materials Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Russell, Andrew and Agne, Sara. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5186

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Russell, Andrew

Agne, Sara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hancock Builders L L C

Defendants

Fixation Systems L L C

Lee'S Pipelines Inc

S & S Paving Construction Inc

Torrent Resources Inc

Beebe Plumbing Inc

Gothic Landscaping Inc

Valley Landscaping L L C

Austin Concrete & Stone L L C

Alpha Geotechnical & Materials Inc

Lees Pipelines Inc

S & S Paving & Construction Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lisa Streu

Defendant Attorneys

Leonard Fink

Catherine Cocchiara

Paul Mittelstadt

R Pierce

Shlomit Gruber

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Joint Stipulation for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSTP - Stipulation (docket date:2/8/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Defendant Valley Landscaping, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:1/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNOTE: JOINT STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketSTP - Stipulation (docket date:1/7/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNOTE: GOTHIC LANDSCAPING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNOTE: ALPHA GEOTECHNICAL & MATERIALS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Regarding Expert Testimony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCER - Certificate (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less