Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 14:01:27 (UTC).

Hali Fields VS T R W Automotive Holdings Corp Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2008 Hali Fields filed an Other lawsuit against T R W Automotive Holdings Corp. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Brnovich, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2965

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Brnovich, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hali Fields

Defendants

T R W Automotive Holdings Corp

Autoliv A S P Inc

Takata Corporation

Robert Bosch G M B H

Mazda Motor Corporation

Key Safety Systems Inc

Autoliv Inc

Siemens A G

Robert Bosch Corporation

Martin Garcia Mendoza

Mazda Motor Of America Inc

In Re

Maricopa County Creditor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

G SHUMWAY

Defendant Attorneys

Jill Goldsmith

C Sorenson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2016
  • DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet (docket date:1/8/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • LED - 2.8 (d) Letter (docket date:9/1/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • SJJ - Satisfaction of Judgment for Jury Fees (docket date:7/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment (docket date:4/6/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • NOTE: Satisfaction of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal (docket date:3/16/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • CAO - Court Of Appeals Order (docket date:3/16/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • NOTE: DISMISSING APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • AIX - Appeals Index (docket date:2/7/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • NOTE: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
357 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2008
  • NOTE: DEFENDANT MAZDA NORTH AMERICAN OPERATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • RES - Response (docket date:9/11/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • NOTE: DEFENDANT MAZDA NORTH AMERICAN OPERATIONS TO CERTIFICATE OF ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • ANS - Answer (docket date:9/17/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • NOTE: PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/27/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • NOTE: MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA INC SERVED 8-21-2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:9/2/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:8/12/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:8/12/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less