This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/19/2021 at 01:03:52 (UTC).

Guillermo J Lopez VS Ana T Chavez

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Guillermo J Lopez filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Ana T Chavez. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Astrowsky, Brad. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4128

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Astrowsky, Brad

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Guillermo J Lopez

Respondent

Ana T Chavez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:2/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNOTE: TO SERVE BY ALTERNATIVE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:1/7/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: TO SERVE BY ALTERNATIVE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:12/29/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service (docket date:11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketAAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less