Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 21:46:50 (UTC).

Geronimo Restaurant L L C Et Al VS Mastro Group L L C, The Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2006 Geronimo Restaurant L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Mastro Group L L C, The. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Hannah, John. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1379

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Hannah, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Geronimo Restaurant L L C

T N T Sons Tavern L L C

Defendants

Mastro Group L L C, The

Michael Mastro

Dennis Mastro

Bubba Nico Restaurant Group L L C

Brenda Mastro

Jody Mastro

J S M& V Restaurant L C

Jessco Restaurants L L C

Jeffrey Mastro

Jane Mastro

Kelley Cordova

Scott Troilo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Loren Molever

Defendant Attorney

Jerry Bonnett

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2007
  • 019 - ME: Ruling (docket date:6/13/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2007
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:6/5/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2007
  • NOTE: OF ERRATA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2007
  • REL - Reply (docket date:6/5/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2007
  • NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF THE MASTRO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2007
  • RES - Response (docket date:5/29/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2007
  • NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2007
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:4/30/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2007
  • NOTE: MASTRO DEFENDANTS' FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2007
  • NDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:4/23/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2006
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:6/14/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2006
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:6/14/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2006
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:6/14/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2006
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:6/14/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2006
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:6/14/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2006
  • 066 - ME: Case Reassigned (docket date:6/9/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2006
  • ANS - Answer (docket date:6/6/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2006
  • NOTE: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF JUDGE/ PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2006
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:6/1/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2006
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:6/1/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less