This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:01:21 (UTC).

Geneva Capital L L C VS Kristin L Harris Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Geneva Capital L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Kristin L Harris. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Garbarino, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1723

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Garbarino, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Geneva Capital L L C

Defendants

Kristin L Harris

Michael N Harris

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Ugalde

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • Docket097 - ME:CIVIL Arrest Warrant Issued (docket date:12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • HearingEvent: Judgment Debtor Exam; Result: Civil Arrest Warrant Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Issued 2020-12-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketIWA Issuance of Warrant (docket date:12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Issued 2020-12-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketIWA Issuance of Warrant (docket date:12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • Docket004 - ME: Hearing Continued (docket date:12/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • HearingEvent: Judgment Debtor Exam; Result: Continuing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: ORDER REQUIRING JUDGMENT DEBTORS TO APPEAR AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Motion for an Order Requiring Judgment Debtors to Appear and Produce Documents / PAID $30.00 R#27997357

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Affidavit of Mailing Re: Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAMN - Affidavit/Cert Mail Notice To Jdgmt/Debtor (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: Geneva Capital L L C Judgment Against: Kristin L Harris Judgment Against: Michael N Harris, Amount: $107,259.45, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketJUD - Judgment (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNFJ - Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less