This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/07/2021 at 02:28:09 (UTC).

Gary Listol VS Joan I Listol

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Gary Listol filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Joan I Listol. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Brain, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4114

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Brain, Mark

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gary Listol

Respondent

Joan I Listol

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kristina Cervone

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCDS - Consent Decree (docket date:2/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:2/17/2021) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case (docket date:1/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate of Service by Private Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less