Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 21:42:08 (UTC).

G Z J Marketing & Finance Ltd VS Stanley Werner Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2006 G Z J Marketing Finance Ltd filed an Other lawsuit against Stanley Werner. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Rees, Brian. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1276

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Rees, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

G Z J Marketing & Finance Ltd

Defendants

Stanley Werner

Therese La Riviere

Helen Siegler

Lillian Werner

Ciscos Financial Inc

Sally Barrella

John W Armstrong

Hasu Doshi

C P Holdings Inc

Phoenix City

Samuel Flamholz

Dorothy Zabell

Peter K Takach

Michael Fabrikant

Dimitrios Tsakoumakis

Paul Galburt

Matthew Siegler

Arthur La Riviere

Eager Beaver Profit Sharing Trust

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Faerber

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2007
  • ORD - Order (docket date:7/6/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • NOTE: GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AGAINST ONLY DEFENDANT MATTHEW SIEGLER AND DISMISSING DEFENDANT MATTHEW SIEGLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2007
  • MSA - Motion To Set Aside Judgment (docket date:6/27/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2007
  • NOTE: UNOPPOSED AS TO ONLY DEFENDANT MATTHEW SIEGLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2007
  • NDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:6/18/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2007
  • NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2007
  • NDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:5/11/2007)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2007
  • NOTE: OF HELEN SIEGLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2006
  • LET - Letter (docket date:8/15/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2006
  • LET - Letter (docket date:8/15/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2006
  • NOTE: EAGER BEAVER PROFIT SHARING TRUST, STANLEY AND LILLIAN WERNER, MATTHEW SIEGLER, CAROL GALBURT SERVED 6/21/06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2006
  • ADE - Application For Default (docket date:7/19/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2006
  • AFD - Affidavit On Default (docket date:7/19/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2006
  • STJ - Stipulated Judgment (docket date:6/22/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2006
  • NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2006
  • LET - Letter (docket date:5/31/2006) (filing party: Defendant(16))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2006
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:5/15/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2006
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:5/15/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2006
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:5/15/2006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2006
  • NOTE: OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less