This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 12/07/2020 at 07:50:44 (UTC).

G & T Custom Homes L L C, Sun Valley Carpet Service Inc Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 G T Custom Homes L L C, Sun Valley Carpet Service Inc was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Gerlach, Douglas and Kiley, Daniel. The case status is Other - Voided.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0289

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Voided

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Gerlach, Douglas

Kiley, Daniel

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

Sun Valley Carpet Service Inc

Plaintiff / Appellant

G & T Custom Homes L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Elisabeth Martini

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Gregory Gillis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • Docket067 - ME: Stipulation And Order (docket date:12/4/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: APPEAL OF FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:12/3/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: APPEAL OF FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION AND SATISFACTION OF FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketSFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:12/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: OFFICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS TRANSCRIPTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNOF - Notice Of Filing (docket date:10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNOTE: AMENDED AND RENEWED/FOR EXPEDITED DETERMINATION OF G&TS MOTION TO STAY ENFORCEMENT OF FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:10/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:10/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNOTE: FOR EXPEDITED DETERMINATION OF G&TS MOTION TO STAY ENFORCEMENT OF FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:10/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNOTE: TO STAY ENFORCEMENT OF FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:10/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: OF ACTION PURSUANT TO ARS 12-904B AND REQUEST TO TRANSMIT RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAJR Appeal for Judicial Review (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less