This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/10/2016 at 06:56:20 (UTC).

Foxworth-Galbraith Lumber Company VS Donald Quackenbush Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2008 Foxworth-Galbraith Lumber Company filed an Other lawsuit against Donald Quackenbush. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Benny, Margaret. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1585

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Benny, Margaret

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Foxworth-Galbraith Lumber Company

Defendants

Donald Quackenbush

Vivian M Brackin

Corso L L C

Avere L L C

K D M Contracting Inc

Redwood Financial L T D

Terra Corp Inc

D L Quackenbush Homes L L C

Keri T Weaver

Karl Weaver

Rodney A Brackin

A A A Insulation L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Potter

Defendant Attorney

TIMOTHY BARTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2009
  • SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment (docket date:10/14/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • NOTE: Satisfaction of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2009
  • JUD - Judgment (docket date:7/30/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2009
  • NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2009
  • REL - Reply (docket date:7/27/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2009
  • NOTE: Reply in Support of Redwood Financials Application for Attorneys Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • RES - Response (docket date:7/14/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • NOTE: IN OPPOSITION TO REDWOOD FINANCIAL LTD'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2009
  • SOC - Statement Of Costs (docket date:6/23/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2009
  • NOTE: Statement of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2008
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:9/15/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • NOTE: OF ERRATA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service (docket date:9/16/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • NOTE: NOVEMBER 3 2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:9/12/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2008
  • 322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss (docket date:9/3/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2008
  • AMC - Amended Complaint (docket date:9/3/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2008
  • NOTE: FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2008
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:6/2/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2008
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:6/2/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less