This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/29/2016 at 04:14:38 (UTC).

Fisher Sand & Gravel Co Et Al VS Infrastructure Dynamics Inc Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2009 Fisher Sand Gravel Co filed an Other lawsuit against Infrastructure Dynamics Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Udall, David. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9639

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Udall, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fisher Sand & Gravel Co

Katherine Portanova

Defendants

Infrastructure Dynamics Inc

Hikmat Meram

Southwest Paving L L C

Westcor/ Surprise L L C

Calportland Company

Lamia Meram

Meram Building West L L C

Farnsworth Wholesale Company

Fisher Sand And Gravel Co

Grimes Trucking And Landscape Supplies Inc

Achen-Gardner Inc

Frances Meram

Cemex Construction Materials South L L C

Keybank N A

Sun Lakes Homeowners Association No 2 Inc

J P Morgan Chase Bank N A

3Rd Party Defendants

Fresh & Easy Neighborhood Market Inc

Bakken Grading And Paving Corp

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Barry Dale

Peter Moolenaar

Michael Minnaugh

James Reed

Adam Decker

Rodger Golston

Jeffrey Zane

Other Attorneys

KENT CAMMACK

John Lohr

Ben Himmelstein

Jeffery Hall

HILLARY GAGNON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2013
  • RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail (docket date:4/20/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail (docket date:5/1/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail (docket date:5/1/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail (docket date:5/1/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail (docket date:5/1/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail (docket date:5/1/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:3/19/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full (docket date:3/19/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • 026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set (docket date:3/11/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:3/1/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
562 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/1/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • NOTE: NORTHERN & 91 LLC SERVED 6/19/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/1/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • NOTE: MERAM BUILDING WEST LLC SERVED 6/19/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:6/23/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • NOTE: OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:6/16/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:6/16/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:6/16/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • NOTE: OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less