This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 22:10:46 (UTC).

First National Bank Of Omaha VS John E Cochran Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 First National Bank Of Omaha filed an Other lawsuit against John E Cochran. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5173

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

First National Bank Of Omaha

Defendants

Michael Dwayne Atha

John E Cochran

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Partridge

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketOXS - Order To Extend Time For Service (docket date:12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: AUTHORIZING ALTERNATIVE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Motion for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Motion to Extend Time for Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2020
  • DocketMXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less