This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/28/2021 at 07:23:34 (UTC).

First International Bank & Trust VS Andrew Sirota Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 First International Bank Trust filed an Other lawsuit against Andrew Sirota. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Duncan, Sally and Garbarino, David. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1718

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Duncan, Sally

Garbarino, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

First International Bank & Trust

Defendants

C E L Services Group Inc

Andrew Sirota

Cynthia Sirota

Receivers

Jeremiah Foster

Resolute Commercial Services L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Jenkins

Receiver Attorney

Michael Harris

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNOTE: TO (I) APPROVE RECEIVERS FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNTING, (II) DISCHARGE RECEIVER, (III) TERMINATE RECEIVERSHIP; AND (IV) /

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond (docket date:2/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNOTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketRNM - Returned Mail (docket date:2/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Filing Receiver's Final Accounting and Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNOF - Notice Of Filing (docket date:2/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNOTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketRNM - Returned Mail (docket date:2/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNOTE: JOINT MOTION FOR ORDER TO (I) APPROVE RECEIVERS FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNTING, (II) DISCHARGE RECEIVER, (III) TERMINATE RECEIVERSHIP, AND (IV) EXONERATE RECEIVERS BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:2/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Application for Appointment of Receiver in Alternative for OSC Why Receiver Should Not Be Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPSC - Petition For Order To Show Cause (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Verified Complaint for Breach of Contract, Breach of Guaranty and Appointment of Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less