This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/24/2018 at 06:33:23 (UTC).

First Fidelity Bank N A VS Jose I Cruz Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2017 First Fidelity Bank N A filed an Other lawsuit against Jose I Cruz. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2137

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

First Fidelity Bank N A

Defendants

Jose I Cruz

Araceli Cruz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Harrison

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/18/2017

NDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:9/19/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2017

NOTE: Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2017

311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:8/30/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2017

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:4/3/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2017

NOTE: ARACELI CRUZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2017

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:4/3/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2017

NOTE: JOSE I CRUZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2017

SUM - Summons (docket date:3/31/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2017

SUM - Summons (docket date:3/31/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2017

COM - Complaint (docket date:3/24/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2017

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:3/24/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2017

CSH - Coversheet (docket date:3/24/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less