This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/16/2020 at 16:09:40 (UTC).

Ewing Irrigation Products Inc VS Jason E Brown

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 Ewing Irrigation Products Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Jason E Brown. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4409

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ewing Irrigation Products Inc

Defendant

Jason E Brown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Allen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/01/2019

JudgementJudgment For: Ewing Irrigation Products Inc Judgment Against: Jason E Brown, Amount: $12,156.03, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2019

JudgementJudgment For: Ewing Irrigation Products Inc Judgment Against: Jason E Brown, Amount: $800.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Attorney Fee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2019

JudgementJudgment For: Ewing Irrigation Products Inc Judgment Against: Jason E Brown, Amount: $341.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2019

DocketNOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2019

DocketJUD - Judgment (docket date:10/1/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2019

DocketNOTE: APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2019

DocketAPL - Application (docket date:9/26/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2019

DocketNOTE: COVENANT NOT TO EXECUTE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2019

DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:9/26/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2019

DocketNOTE: STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2019

DocketSFJ - Stipulation For Judgment (docket date:9/26/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2019

DocketNOTE: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, AND WAIVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2019

DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:5/1/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2019

DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:4/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2019

DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:4/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2019

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:4/17/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less