This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/19/2021 at 01:03:18 (UTC).

Evie Jo Holmgren VS Clifford Alan Kosterman

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Evie Jo Holmgren filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Clifford Alan Kosterman. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Lori and Covil, Max. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4125

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Lori

Covil, Max

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Evie Jo Holmgren

Respondent

Clifford Alan Kosterman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketOLS - Order Dismiss Lack Of Service (docket date:1/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service (docket date:11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less