This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 08/27/2016 at 07:23:38 (UTC).

Evans Dove & Nelson P L C VS Southwest Diagnostic Imaging Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2013 Evans Dove Nelson P L C filed an Other lawsuit against Southwest Diagnostic Imaging. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Southeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Talamante, David. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0131

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Talamante, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Evans Dove & Nelson P L C

Defendants

Southwest Diagnostic Imaging

West Valley Hospital

Kalie Jonovich

Bryan Jonovich

Russell Duquette

Core Institute, The

Hanger Prosthetics

Arizona Orthopedic Physical Therapy

B & B Surgical Assist

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAZ EVANS

Defendant Attorneys

Emily Armstrong

David Ledyard

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2013
  • DocketRTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail (docket date:12/31/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • DocketRTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail (docket date:12/30/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • DocketNRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit (docket date:12/24/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • DocketNOTE: $8,572.47 TO ARIZONA ORTHOPEDIC PHYSICAL THERAPY PLLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • DocketNRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit (docket date:12/24/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • DocketNOTE: $2,417.88 TO THE CORE INSTITUTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • Docket021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order (docket date:12/20/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:12/19/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • DocketNOTE: Order TO DISBURSE FUNDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketSTP - Stipulation (docket date:12/11/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2013
  • DocketCAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration (docket date:3/28/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate of Agreement re: Compulsory Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:3/28/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • DocketNOTE: Defendant, Arizona Orthopedic Physical Therapy's Answer to Complaint in Interpleader

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:2/27/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • DocketNOTE: ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE ALL DEFENDANTS BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:2/7/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • DocketNOTE: MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE PURSUANT TO A.R.C.P. 4.1 (m)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:1/31/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:1/31/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less