Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/05/2016 at 06:34:14 (UTC).

Estate Of Lois May Levering, The Et Al VS Brookdale Senior Living Inc Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2015 Estate Of Lois May Levering, The filed an Other lawsuit against Brookdale Senior Living Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Talamante, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1446

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Talamante, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Estate Of Lois May Levering, The

Donald Levering

Defendants

Brookdale Senior Living Inc

Senior Lifestyle Heritage L L C

B K D Personal Assistance Services L L C

Heritage Member Services Club L L C, The

Horizon Bay Realty L L C

Horizon Bay Management L L C

Horizon Bay Management I I, L L C

Horizon Bay Management C C R C, L L C

Horizon Bay H P Management L L C

Horizon Bay Chartwell L L C

Horizon Bay Chartwell I I, L L C

Melissa Miloz

Vincent Jacobi

Kay Jacobi

Craig Miloz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Ryan

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony Fernandez

Kevin Nicholas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2015
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:12/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • NOTE: Notice of Change of Firm Name and Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • NOTE: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF DESIGNATION RE AREAS OF EXPERT TESTIMONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel (docket date:11/9/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • NOTE: ORDER RE SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • STP - Stipulation (docket date:11/2/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • NOTE: Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • ORD - Order (docket date:9/8/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • NOTE: RULE 16 COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2015
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:4/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • NOTE: BKD PERSONAL ASSISTANCE SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • NOF - Notice Of Filing (docket date:4/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • NOTE: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • AMC - Amended Complaint (docket date:4/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • NOTE: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:3/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:3/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:3/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:3/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less