Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 18:03:58 (UTC).

Essco Wholesale Electric Inc VS A A & J Builders L L C Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2008 Essco Wholesale Electric Inc filed an Other lawsuit against A A J Builders L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4935

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Essco Wholesale Electric Inc

Defendants

A A & J Builders L L C

Andrew Parada

Red Star Plumbing

Just Rite Acoustics Of Arizona Inc

Ace Asphalt Of Arizona Inc

Distinctive Roofing L L C

Fountain Of Life Worship Inc

American Pride Electric L L C

Metro Phoenix Bank

Nicholas Consolidated Inc

Stalwart Properties Inc

Lisa A Parada

Community Bank Of Arizona

Mule Train Construction L L C

Other

Wells Fargo Bank N A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Veronica Manolio

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2009
  • NDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:9/14/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2009
  • NOTE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • 079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial (docket date:9/11/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment (docket date:9/16/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:9/4/2009) (filing party: Defendant(15))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • NOTE: Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Lisa A. Parada Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • JAG - Judgment Against Garnishee (docket date:8/26/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2009
  • 005 - ME: Hearing (docket date:8/19/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2009
  • DFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:8/25/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2009
  • NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/24/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2008
  • NOTE: COMMUNITY BANK OF ARIZONA SERVED 12-19-2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/24/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2008
  • NOTE: AMERICAN PRIDE ELECTRIC LLC SERVED 12-16-2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/24/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2008
  • NOTE: A A & J BUILDERS LLC SERVED 12-16-2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2008
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:12/18/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2008
  • CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:12/18/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2008
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:12/18/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2008
  • NOTE: OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less