This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 08:34:02 (UTC).

Eric A Ross VS Sara E Ross

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Eric A Ross filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Sara E Ross. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are VandenBerg, Lisa and Pineda, Susanna. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0038

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Northwest Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

VandenBerg, Lisa

Pineda, Susanna

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Eric A Ross

Respondents

Sara E Ross

Sara E Obrien

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/24/2020

DocketNOTE:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2020

DocketIWO Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access (docket date:4/24/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2020

JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2020

DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2020

DocketCDS - Consent Decree (docket date:4/24/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2020

DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:4/7/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2020

DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:2/4/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2020

DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:1/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2020

DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:1/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2020

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:1/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2020

DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:1/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2020

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:1/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less