This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/25/2016 at 10:53:30 (UTC).

Equable Ascent Financial L L C VS Kevin J Redden

Case Summary

On 05/30/2012 Equable Ascent Financial L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Kevin J Redden. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3241

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equable Ascent Financial L L C

Defendant

Kevin J Redden

Other

Wells Fargo Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amara Edblad

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/13/2014

SJG - SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO GARNISHEE ONLY (docket date:1/13/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2014

NOTE: NOTICE OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2013

JAG - Judgment Against Garnishee (docket date:12/13/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2013

APL - Application (docket date:11/26/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2013

NOTE: APPLICATION FOR GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE ON WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (Monies or Property)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2013

SOC - Statement Of Costs (docket date:11/26/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2013

NOTE: STATEMENT OF COSTS AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS (For Non-Earnings Garnishment)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2013

CRT - Certification Of Mailing (docket date:11/5/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2013

NOTE: Certificate of Mailing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2013

ORD - Order (docket date:10/28/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
02/26/2013

NOTE: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO J. DOE SPOUSE ONLY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2012

311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:10/31/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2012

023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:7/25/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2012

AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:7/23/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2012

NOTE: Application for and Affidavit on Entry of Default

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2012

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:6/19/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2012

NOTE: KEVIN J REDDEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2012

SUM - Summons (docket date:6/15/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2012

COM - Complaint (docket date:5/31/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2012

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:5/31/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less