This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 20:30:36 (UTC).

Emidla Ledesma Gamez VS Jorge Gonzalez Garcia

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Emidla Ledesma Gamez filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Jorge Gonzalez Garcia. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Wein, Kevin. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5672

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Wein, Kevin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Emidla Ledesma Gamez

Respondent

Jorge Gonzalez Garcia

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • Docket020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement (docket date:1/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Decree of Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDDI - Decree Of Dissolution (docket date:1/8/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNOTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketIWO Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access (docket date:1/8/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • HearingEvent: Trial/Evidentiary Hearing; Result: Minute Entry Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • Docket089 - ME: Trial Setting (docket date:10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNOTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketIWO Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access (docket date:10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING WITH JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: FOR LEGAL DECISION MAKING AND PHYSICAL CUSTODY / PARENTING TIME / CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less