This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 09/04/2020 at 09:55:09 (UTC).

Emanuel Balint VS Dragana A Balint

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Emanuel Balint filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Dragana A Balint. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Blair, Michael and Ireland, Jacki. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0351

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Blair, Michael

Ireland, Jacki

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Emanuel Balint

Respondent

Dragana A Balint

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • HearingEvent: Decree on Demand - Regular

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: TO REINSTATE DISMISSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:8/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketNOTE: TO REINSTATE DISMISSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:8/17/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketOLP - Order Dismiss Lack Prosecution (docket date:8/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:7/8/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:6/16/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketNOTE: ALIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:6/2/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketAMC - Amended Complaint (docket date:6/2/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketNIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case (docket date:5/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:1/29/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:1/15/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:1/15/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:1/15/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:1/15/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:1/15/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less