This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 12/08/2021 at 19:50:25 (UTC).

Emad Zaki VS Richard K Walker Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/11/2020 Emad Zaki filed an Other lawsuit against Richard K Walker. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomason, Timothy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4476

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Thomason, Timothy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emad Zaki

Defendants

Richard K Walker

Walker & Peskind P L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Levine

Defendant Attorney

James Brewer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNOTE: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPLICATION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketNOTE: DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE REGARDING COMPULSORY ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration (docket date:11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketNOTE: DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketNOTE: DEFENDANTS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketNJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketNOTE: APPLICATION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketNOTE: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less