This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/25/2016 at 05:34:40 (UTC).

Elizabeth Macgregor VS Patrick B Estes

Case Summary

On 05/14/2008 Elizabeth Macgregor filed an Other lawsuit against Patrick B Estes. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Starr, Patricia. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0928

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Starr, Patricia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elizabeth Macgregor

Defendant

Patrick B Estes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jack Hirsch

Defendant Attorney

JAMES CURRAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/08/2010

081 - ME: Trial Vacated (docket date:10/8/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2010

ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:10/15/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2010

NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2010

SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:10/6/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2010

NOTE: OF ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2010

089 - ME: Trial Setting (docket date:9/17/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2010

029 - ME: Status Conference (docket date:6/18/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2010

STA - Statement (docket date:6/18/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2010

NOTE: JOINT STATUS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2010

ORD - Order (docket date:5/12/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
11/28/2008

324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator (docket date:11/28/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2008

ANS - Answer (docket date:11/7/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2008

NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:11/7/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2008

311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:10/15/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2008

APU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:8/29/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2008

NOTE: PATRICK B ESTES AND JANE DOE ESTES SERVED 8/27/08

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2008

322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss (docket date:8/20/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2008

AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:6/24/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2008

COM - Complaint (docket date:5/16/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2008

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:5/16/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less