This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/25/2016 at 06:21:48 (UTC).

Elise Anderson Et Al VS Ed Dzuik Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2011 Elise Anderson filed an Other lawsuit against Ed Dzuik. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Brnovich, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6349

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Brnovich, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Elise Anderson

Jason Shepherd

Defendants

Ed Dzuik

Annalee Dziuk

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Wade

Defendant Attorney

Robert Stanewich

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/08/2014

022 - ME: Order Signed (docket date:7/8/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2014

ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:7/25/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2014

NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2014

SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:6/25/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2014

NOTE: Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2014

375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar (docket date:4/30/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2014

NOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:4/24/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2014

NOTE: Notice of Settlement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2014

023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:4/15/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2014

089 - ME: Trial Setting (docket date:2/18/2014)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
12/21/2011

NOTE: Jury Demand

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2011

ANS - Answer (docket date:12/22/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2011

NOTE: Answer/Efile billing $223.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2011

CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration (docket date:12/22/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2011

NOTE: Certificate of Agreement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2011

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/7/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2011

NOTE: ANNALEE DZIUK AND ED DZIUK SERVED 11/8/11

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2011

SUM - Summons (docket date:11/28/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2011

COM - Complaint (docket date:11/9/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2011

CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:11/9/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less