Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/30/2016 at 09:53:28 (UTC).

Elaine Randall VS Kenneth Raymond Legan Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/24/2014 Elaine Randall filed an Other lawsuit against Kenneth Raymond Legan. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Gass, David. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3177

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Gass, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elaine Randall

Defendants

Kenneth Raymond Legan

Kendall Legan

Barbie Young

C A C V Of Colorado

Maricopa County Assessor

Maricopa County General Hospital

Cherie R Veys

John Hanson

Rosemarie Hanson

Bank Of America

Deimes McCutcheon Company, The

Herbert McLaughlin

Dorothy McLaughlin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pascal Goddard

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2015
  • ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:9/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • NOTE: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:9/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • NOTE: Stipulation for Dismissal of All Claims with Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • 078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar (docket date:7/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:4/1/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:3/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • NOTE: BARBIE YOUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:3/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • NOTE: KENDALL LEGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:3/9/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:3/9/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • AMC - Amended Complaint (docket date:2/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • NOTE: Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • 322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss (docket date:1/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:10/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:10/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:10/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:10/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • NOTE: OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less