This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/11/2021 at 18:25:50 (UTC).

Edwin Gary B Paredes VS Delia S Devibar

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Edwin Gary B Paredes filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Delia S Devibar. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Julian, Melissa. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3014

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Julian, Melissa

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Edwin Gary B Paredes

Respondent

Delia S Devibar

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:2/3/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case (docket date:1/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:11/30/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service (docket date:11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:11/3/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: TO BE EXCUSED FROM PARTICIPATION IN THE PARENT INFORMATION PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:9/30/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less