This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/04/2020 at 07:28:09 (UTC).

Edwardo A Vazquez VS Kailey M Telles

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Edwardo A Vazquez filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Kailey M Telles. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Pineda, Susanna. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1708

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northwest Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Pineda, Susanna

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Edwardo A Vazquez

Respondent

Kailey M Telles

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • HearingEvent: Trial/Evidentiary Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docket056 - ME: Hearing Set (docket date:9/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • HearingEvent: Resolution Management Conference; Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: PRE-DECREE / TEMPORARY / WITHOUT NOTICE FOR LEGAL DECISION MAKING AND PHYSICAL CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: PRE DECREE TEMPORARY ORDER WITHOUT NOTICE FOR LEGAL DECISION MAKING AND PHYSICAL CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less