Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 08:50:22 (UTC).

Edward Mora VS Larry H Miller Corporation - Avondale Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2008 Edward Mora filed an Other lawsuit against Larry H Miller Corporation - Avondale. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Brnovich, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0570

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Brnovich, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edward Mora

Defendants

Larry H Miller Corporation - Avondale

Avondale Automotive Inc

Eisenberg Company

Avondale Automotive Imports Inc

Macpie L L C

Gateway Chevrolet Inc

Earnhardt Avondale Inc

Germain Of Avondale L L C

Avondale Motor Company L L C

Saturn Of West Phoenix Inc

C D G Automotive L L C

A Z V T, L L C

T E F Management Corp Inc

Plohal Inc

Earnhardt Ford Sales Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Zachar

Defendant Attorneys

Gary Burger

RICHARD WOODS

Laurence Sharlot

Darrell Davis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2009
  • 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated (docket date:10/8/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:10/15/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:9/17/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment (docket date:8/19/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • AFF - Affidavit (docket date:8/20/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • NOTE: OF TERESA REEDER-WAMPLER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AZVT LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • SOF - Statement Of Facts (docket date:8/19/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • NOTE: MATERIAL/IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/9/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2008
  • NOTE: AVONDALE MOTOR COMPANY LLC SERVED 4-25-2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/9/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2008
  • NOTE: EARNHARDT FORD SALES COMPANY SERVED 4-28-2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/9/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2008
  • NOTE: EARNHARDT AVONDALE INC SERVED 4-28-2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:5/9/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2008
  • NOTE: TEF MANAGEMENT CORP SERVED 4-28-2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2008
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:2/26/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2008
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:2/26/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less