This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/30/2016 at 06:14:12 (UTC).

Eddie Willie Taylor VS Consumer Credit Bureaus Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2009 Eddie Willie Taylor filed an Other lawsuit against Consumer Credit Bureaus. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Udall, David. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1611

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2009

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Udall, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eddie Willie Taylor

Defendants

Consumer Credit Bureaus

C B Cinnovis

Transunion L L C

Kroll Factual Data Bureau

U S Internal Revenue Service, The

Department Of The Treasury, The

Arizona Education Loan Marketing Corporation

Equifax Credit Information Service

Lamson Junior College

United States Federal Government, The

U S Department Of Education, The

Southwest Student Services Corporation

Experian

Landsafe Credit Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Philip Wooten

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2009
  • 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:12/7/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • ADE - Application For Default (docket date:12/14/2009) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2009
  • 066 - ME: Case Reassigned (docket date:11/23/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2009
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:11/24/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2009
  • NOTE: OF ERRATA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2009
  • NUS - Notice Of Removal Us District Court (docket date:11/30/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2009
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:11/19/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2009
  • NUS - Notice Of Removal Us District Court (docket date:11/17/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2009
  • NOTE: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • RES - Response (docket date:11/16/2009) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • NOTE: TO MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2009
  • CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:11/9/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2009
  • MTD - Motion To Dismiss (docket date:11/12/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2009
  • NOTE: TRANS UNTION LLC'S OR IN THE ALTERNTAIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:10/9/2009) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration (docket date:10/9/2009) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • AFF - Affidavit (docket date:10/9/2009) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • NOTE: OF EDDIE WILLIE TAYLOR JR

    Read MoreRead Less