This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 16:36:28 (UTC).

Echo Miranda VS Dustin J Miranda

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Echo Miranda filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Dustin J Miranda. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Bergin, Dawn and Ash, Lori. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2550

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Bergin, Dawn

Ash, Lori

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Echo Miranda

Respondent

Dustin J Miranda

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/06/2021

HearingEvent: Decree on Demand - Regular

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2021

DocketNOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND DISMISSAL DATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2021

DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:4/13/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2021

DocketMAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution (docket date:3/3/2021) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2021

DocketNIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case (docket date:2/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2020

DocketNOTE: Application and Affidavit for Entry of Default in Family Cases

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2020

DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:12/23/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2020

DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:11/3/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020

DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:10/26/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/26/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020

DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:10/26/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020

DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:10/26/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:10/26/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less