This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 03/01/2021 at 06:57:32 (UTC).

Eastgroup Properties L P VS Allen Timmer Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Eastgroup Properties L P filed an Other lawsuit against Allen Timmer. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1729

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eastgroup Properties L P

Defendants

Shutter Source L L C, The

Allen Timmer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Nach

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketAWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment (docket date:2/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: Eastgroup Properties L P Judgment Against: Shutter Source L L C, The, Amount: $10,752.35, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: Eastgroup Properties L P Judgment Against: Shutter Source L L C, The, Amount: $592.80, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNOTE: AGAINST DEFENDANT THE SHUTTER SOURCE, LLC ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:2/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • HearingEvent: Default Hearing; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNOTE: ORDER GRANTING [SECOND] MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR COMPLETION OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ALLEN TIMMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOXS - Order To Extend Time For Service (docket date:2/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNOTE: [SECOND] MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR COMPLETION OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ALLEN TIMMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketMXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:2/9/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: VERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less