Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/29/2016 at 06:24:37 (UTC).

Donald Switzenberg Et Al VS Michael Merriman Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2015 Donald Switzenberg filed an Other lawsuit against Michael Merriman. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kiley, Daniel. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0239

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kiley, Daniel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Donald Switzenberg

H S Lucky L L C

Y H R A E E Investments L L C

Defendants

Michael Merriman

Patricia Merriman

Merriman Family Trust, The

Jeff Schneidman

Plattner Schneidman Schneider And Jeffries P C

T D R, L L C

Downtowner L L C, The

Triple Siete L L C

Stony Ground L L C

Xanadu Investments L L C

Rainbow Valley Investments L L C

B P M T B Investments L L C

Rainbow Valley 2011, L L C

Ann Schneidman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Franklyn Jeans

Defendant Attorneys

Richard Nye

Anna Branson

Russell Yurk

Julie Coleman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2016
  • 066 - ME: Case Reassigned (docket date:6/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • 026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set (docket date:6/2/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • NPD - Notice Case on Dismissal Calendar (docket date:5/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • ANS - Answer (docket date:5/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • NOTE: Schneidman Defendants' Answer to First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • JSR Joint Scheduling Report (docket date:5/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • NOTE: Joint Report and Proposed Scheduling Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • ANS - Answer (docket date:5/4/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • NOTE: Defendants Answer to First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • NOF - Notice Of Filing (docket date:4/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2015
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • NOTE: RAINBOW VALLEY 2011 LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • NOTE: ANN SCHNEIDMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:8/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:8/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:8/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:8/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:8/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:8/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less