This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/06/2016 at 05:39:56 (UTC).

Don C Chiappetti VS (2) Maricopa County

Case Summary

On 12/08/2009 Don C Chiappetti filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against 2 Maricopa County. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is VandenBerg, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0743

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

VandenBerg, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Don C Chiappetti

Defendant

(2) Maricopa County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Doyle

Defendant Attorney

Louis Comus

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2010
  • 371 - Me: Judgment Signed - Prop Tax (docket date:9/16/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • JUD - Judgment (docket date:9/20/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • ORD - Order (docket date:7/28/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • 078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar (docket date:7/26/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2010
  • NOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:7/22/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2010
  • NOTE: PROPOSED AND MOTION TO VACATE TRIAL SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • 089 - ME: Trial Setting (docket date:3/30/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2010
  • ANS - Answer (docket date:3/18/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2010
  • NOTE: TO COMPLAINT AND NOTICE OF PROPERTY TAX APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/9/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:12/9/2009) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • NOTE: AND NOTICE OF APPEAL PROPERTY TAX APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less