This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/26/2020 at 09:41:22 (UTC).

Diosceline Benitez Leon VS Sergio David Gonzalez Martinez

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Diosceline Benitez Leon filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Sergio David Gonzalez Martinez. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Wein, Kevin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5662

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Wein, Kevin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Diosceline Benitez Leon

Respondent

Sergio David Gonzalez Martinez

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Desiree Kerfoot

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:10/29/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:9/23/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/23/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less