This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/21/2020 at 04:23:55 (UTC).

Diana Marie Carrizoza VS Lavont H Hudson

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Diana Marie Carrizoza filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Lavont H Hudson. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Nicholls, Suzanne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4110

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Nicholls, Suzanne

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Diana Marie Carrizoza

Respondent

Lavont H Hudson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • HearingEvent: Decree on Demand - Regular

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:10/22/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:10/5/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less