Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 15:00:44 (UTC).

Dial Finance L L C VS Spencer Schupbach Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2008 Dial Finance L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Spencer Schupbach. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3451

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dial Finance L L C

Defendants

Spencer Schupbach

Lori Forbes

Lisa Brennan Stiver

Toni C Ganoff

P J Goben

Connie Schupbach

Automotive Finance Corporation

Lisa Vincitorio

Gerald Stiver

3Rd Party Defendant

Joseph Douglas Vincitorio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Sarah Anchors

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2010
  • 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full (docket date:10/1/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2010
  • 005 - ME: Hearing (docket date:4/16/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2010
  • 005 - ME: Hearing (docket date:4/14/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • ORD - Order (docket date:4/22/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • NOTE: SETTING AN INITIAL HEARING ON THE MOTION TO ENFORCE CHARGING LIEN AND TO FREEZE DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUND FILED BY LAW OFFICES OF MARCH D SVEJDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • REQ - Request (docket date:4/20/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • NOTE: FOR EMERGENCY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:4/20/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • NOTE: EMERGENCY/TO ENFORCE CHARGING LIEN AND TO FREEZE DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:4/20/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2009
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:2/3/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:1/27/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2009
  • NOTE: SERVED CONNIE SCHUPBACH 01/12/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:1/27/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2009
  • NOTE: SERVED SPENCER SCHUPBACH 01/12/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:1/21/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • NOTE: OF COMPLETION OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2008
  • 322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss (docket date:12/17/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:9/15/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/15/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less