This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/04/2020 at 09:22:05 (UTC).

Denise Wilkins Et Al VS Christopher Wood Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Denise Wilkins filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Christopher Wood. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Ireland, Jacki and Edelstein, Monica. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5659

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Ireland, Jacki

Edelstein, Monica

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Denise Wilkins

Patrick Wilkins

Respondents

Makenna Olson

Christopher Wood

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Theresa Seifert

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketREP - Report (docket date:11/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketREP - Report (docket date:11/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docket292 - ME: ORDERS REGARDING LEGAL DECISION MAKING (docket date:10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • HearingEvent: Status Conference; Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Application and Affidavit for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketEXW - Exhibits Work Sheet (docket date:10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNOTE: DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MOTION FOR PRE DECREE TEMPORAY ORDERS RE LEGAL DECISION MAKING AUTHORITY AND PARENTING TIME WITHOUT NOTICE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE WITH NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: TEMPORARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE USING THE GOTOMEETING APPLICATION FOR AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON 10/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketORA - Order To Appear (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less