This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 02:32:01 (UTC).

Debra Marie Krystofik VS Robert Allen Krystofik

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Debra Marie Krystofik filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Robert Allen Krystofik. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Mandell, Michael and Crandell, Rusty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6844

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Mandell, Michael

Crandell, Rusty

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Debra Marie Krystofik

Respondent

Robert Allen Krystofik

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:10/1/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less