This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:01:16 (UTC).

Debora Stripp Et Al VS Lauren Bridwell

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Debora Stripp filed an Other lawsuit against Lauren Bridwell. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, James. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1722

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James Stripp

Debora Stripp

Defendant

Lauren Bridwell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Rubin

Defendant Attorney

Rachel Wolf

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pre-Trial Conference; Result: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docket375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar (docket date:2/8/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:2/5/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketSCO Scheduling Order (docket date:12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • Docket026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set (docket date:12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Joint Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketJSR Joint Scheduling Report (docket date:12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Plaintiffs Notice of Offer of Judgement to Defendant Lauren Bridwell

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNOTE: ANSWER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT / EFILE BILLING $245.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: LAUREN BRIDEWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less