This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/10/2016 at 07:33:32 (UTC).

David Auble Et Al VS Newmark Holdings I, L L C Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2008 David Auble filed an Other lawsuit against Newmark Holdings I, L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Talamante, David. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2102

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2008

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Talamante, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and In Re

David Auble

Cristy Auble

Sarah Auble

Defendants

Newmark Holdings I, L L C

(5) Maricopa County

Ava Arpaio

Joseph M Arpaio

Maricopa Co Risk Management

(6) Maricopa County Sheriffs Office

Tehran Ryles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeremy Geigle

Defendant Attorney

PAUL LAZARUS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2009
  • 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:1/21/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/16/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2008
  • NOTE: NEWMARK HOLDINGS I LLC SERVED 10/6/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2008
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:10/7/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2008
  • NOTE: TO ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2008
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:10/7/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2008
  • NOTE: TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2008
  • ANS - Answer (docket date:9/30/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2008
  • NOTE: CO-CHG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:9/19/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:9/17/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE SERVED 09/08/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:9/17/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • NOTE: JOSEPH M ARPAIO SERVED 09/08/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:9/17/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY SERVED 09/08/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2008
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:8/21/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2008
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:8/21/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2008
  • CER - Certificate (docket date:8/21/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2008
  • NOTE: ON EXPERT TESTIMONY

    Read MoreRead Less